Byrne v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alecia Byrne
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Alecia Byrne of Voluntary Dismissal between Plaintiff and Defendant, Equifax Information Services, LLC (Kosla, Taylor)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. (To correct the date per Order Dkt. #12 .)(cjs)
February 11, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Katherine A Neben for Experian Information Solutions Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Alecia Byrne, Experian Information Solutions Inc re #1 Complaint, #9 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/12/2019. (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 3/25/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 10:00 AM (Mountain Time) in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Katherine A. Neben. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1846767.)William C Pooser appearing for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (Pooser, William)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Pooser, William)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Pooser, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Taylor Kosla for Alecia Byrne. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Settlement documents due no later than 3/7/19. (lc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Alecia Byrne (Geile, Patrick)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Taylor Kosla. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1837713.)Patrick John Geile appearing for Plaintiff Alecia Byrne. Responses due by 2/13/2019 (Geile, Patrick)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alecia Byrne. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Geile, Patrick)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alecia Byrne. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Geile, Patrick)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Equifax Information Services, LLC)(cjs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1833112.), filed by Byrne Alecia. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Geile, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrne v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Katherine A Neben
Represented By: William C Pooser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alecia Byrne
Represented By: Patrick John Geile
Represented By: Taylor Kosla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?