Daye v. Nampa School District #131

Plaintiff: James L Daye
Defendant: Nampa School District #131
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2019. Discovery due by 11/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2019. ADR must be held by 11/10/2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY PLAN by Nampa School District #131 re #9 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan . (Julian, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Nampa School District #131. (Julian, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement filed byMary R. Grant on behalf of James L Daye. (Grant, Mary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L Daye. All Defendants. (Grant, Mary)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Jamie Bracke, and requests adifferent date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on March 13, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before March 6, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (km)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for James L Daye, Nampa School District #131 re #3 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/2/2019. (alw)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Nampa School District #131.(Julian, Brian)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nampa School District #131. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1838635.), filed by James L Daye. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Huntley, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daye v. Nampa School District #131
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Daye
Represented By: Robert C Huntley
Represented By: Mary R. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nampa School District #131
Represented By: Bret Allen Walther
Represented By: Brian K Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?