Western Watersheds Project v. Interior Board of Land Appeals et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Department of the Interior and Interior Board of Land Appeals
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Marie Backsen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Backsen, Megan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Watersheds Project. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Lucas, Laurence)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Lucas, Laurence)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior, Interior Board of Land Appeals, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1840531.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A IBLA Decision, #2 Exhibit Attachment B ALJ Decision, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons IBLA, #5 Summons DOI)(Lucas, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. Interior Board of Land Appeals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Represented By: Todd C Tucci
Represented By: Megan Marie Backsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interior Board of Land Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?