Mendez v. City of Boise et al
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Defendant: Heather Buchanan, Joseph Hodges, Shawn Steiger, City of Boise Public Works Department, Kimberlee Irby, Debbie Allen, City of Boise, David Bieter, City of Boise Council and Scott Muir
Case Number: 1:2019cv00049
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand Scott B Muir appearing for Defendants Debbie Allen, David Bieter, Heather Buchanan, City of Boise, City of Boise Council, City of Boise Public Works Department, Joseph Hodges, Kimberlee Irby, Scott Muir, Shawn Steiger. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Muir, Scott)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case CV01-19-00229 ROA by Plaintiff Raul Mendez re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Small Claims case number CV01-19-00229, #2 Answer, #3 Motion to Dismiss Small Claim, #4 Affidavit in support, #5 Response to Demand, Demand for Payment, email, & Residential Request for Cacancy Status Application, #6 Response tio Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(jp)
February 14, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Raul Mendez was filed incomplete. Please submit all state court documents & docket sheet (or ROA) as soon as possible.(jp)
February 7, 2019 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt # IDX100023728 PAID IN FULL (cjs)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND COUNTERCLAIM by Raul Mendez from Ada County (Small Claims), case number CV01-19-0029, filed by Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. City of Boise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Buchanan
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hodges
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Steiger
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise Public Works Department
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberlee Irby
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Allen
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bieter
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise Council
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Muir
Represented By: Scott B Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?