Wisdom v. Barry
Petitioner: Ronald Wisdom
Respondent: Wayman Barry
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Ronald Wisdom, counsel for Wayman Barry re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/15/2019. (cjs)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ronald Wisdom.(cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Wisdom. (cjs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Ronald Wisdom. Responses due by 3/4/2019 (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisdom v. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wayman Barry
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?