French v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Kristy French
Defendant: USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:153
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Nora K Cook for USAA Federal Savings Bank Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David M Krueger for USAA Federal Savings Bank Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Nora K. Cook. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1869659.)Matthew L Walters appearing for Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Walters, Matthew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David M. Krueger. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1869656.)Matthew L Walters appearing for Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Walters, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kristy French (Ballard, Ryan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kristy French, USAA Federal Savings Bank re #6 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/31/2019. (alw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Walters, Matthew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by USAA Federal Savings Bank.(Walters, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint Litigation Plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 12, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00066-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristy French. All Defendants. (Ballard, Ryan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1852203.), filed by Kristy French. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy French
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: Nora K Cook
Represented By: David M Krueger
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?