Wahl v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chad L Wahl
Defendant: Kip Laury, Aaron Hofer, Corizon, LLC, TJ Mayer, Rebekah M Haggard, Rona Siegert, William Rogers, Sikko barghoorn, Summer Eldridge, Corizon Health, Inc., Anthony Bushnell, Stephen Bartlett and Ralph M Sutherlin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Richard S Rutherford appearing for Defendant Stephen Bartlett. Responses due by 5/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rutherford, Richard)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge William B. Shubb. Case Management deadline set for 7/22/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 8, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00068-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (correcting typographical error in paragraph 23) by Sikko Barghoorn.(Kane, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Alexander Eaton on behalf of Anthony Bushnell, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC, Summer Eldridge, Rebekah M Haggard, Aaron Hofer, William Rogers, Ralph M Sutherlin (Eaton, Dylan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Corizon Health, Inc. for Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC.. (Alder, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Anthony Bushnell, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC, Summer Eldridge, Rebekah M Haggard, Aaron Hofer, William Rogers, Ralph M Sutherlin.(Alder, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Rulon Alder on behalf of Anthony Bushnell, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC, Summer Eldridge, Rebekah M Haggard, Aaron Hofer, William Rogers, Ralph M Sutherlin (Alder, Andrew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER by Plaintiff Chad L Wahl. (Earl, Ryan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Sikko Barghoorn, Kip Laury, TJ Mayer, Rona Siegert, Chad L Wahl re #1 Complaint, #7 Stipulation, #8 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/3/2019. (jp)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sikko Barghoorn.(Kane, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension by Kip Laury, TJ Mayer, Rona Siegert. (Larrondo, Megan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Marie Hayes on behalf of Kip Laury, TJ Mayer, Rona Siegert (Hayes, Leslie)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ann Larrondo on behalf of Kip Laury, TJ Mayer, Rona Siegert (Larrondo, Megan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad L Wahl. Stephen Bartlett served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019; Summer Eldridge served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Rebekah M Haggard served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Aaron Hofer served on 3/16/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; TJ Mayer served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; William Rogers served on 3/17/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Rona Siegert served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019; Ralph M Sutherlin served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed)(Earl, Ryan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad L Wahl. Sikko Barghoorn served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019; Anthony Bushnell served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Corizon Health, Inc. served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019; Corizon, LLC served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019; Kip Laury served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed, #2 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed)(Earl, Ryan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sikko Barghoorn, Stephen Bartlett, Anthony Bushnell, Corizon Health, Inc., Corizon, LLC, Summer Eldridge, Rebekah M Haggard, Aaron Hofer, Kip Laury, TJ Mayer, William Rogers, Rona Siegert, Ralph M Sutherlin. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(jp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1852310.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Cover Sheet)(Earl, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahl v. Corizon Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Laury
Represented By: Megan Ann Larrondo
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hofer
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Mayer
Represented By: Megan Ann Larrondo
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah M Haggard
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rona Siegert
Represented By: Megan Ann Larrondo
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rogers
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikko barghoorn
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Eldridge
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bushnell
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bartlett
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph M Sutherlin
Represented By: Andrew Rulon Alder
Represented By: Dylan Alexander Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad L Wahl
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?