Goettling et al v. Complete Compliance LLC
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Peppersack and Jamie Lee Goettling
Defendant: Complete Compliance LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Jamie Lee Goettling, Matthew J. Peppersack. (Howell, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default John M Howell appearing for Plaintiffs Jamie Lee Goettling, Matthew J. Peppersack. Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Howell in Support)(Howell, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Lee Goettling, Matthew J. Peppersack. Complete Compliance LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Howell, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint Litigation Plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 12, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00070-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Complete Compliance LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Complete Compliance LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1852842.), filed by Jamie Lee Goettling, Matthew J. Peppersack. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goettling et al v. Complete Compliance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Peppersack
Represented By: John M Howell
Represented By: William Dustin Charters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Goettling
Represented By: John M Howell
Represented By: William Dustin Charters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Compliance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?