Thompson v. Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC

Plaintiff: David A. Thompson
Defendant: Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 6/10/2019., Discovery due by 11/22/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2019., ADR must be held by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by Jeff Sykes for the Plaintiff; Derek Sachs and Debora Kristensen Grasham for the Defendant. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/10/2019. Court noted Stipulated Ligation and Discovery Plans were filed in this matter. Parties agree to participate in a Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference on or before 11/29/2019. Consent process discussed. Telephonic Status Conference to be set for 10/10/2019, with specific time to be included in forthcoming Scheduling Order. Time in Court 11:35-11:40 AM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Derek Sachs for Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Derek S. Sachs. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1866250.)Debora Kristensen Grasham appearing for Defendant Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC. Responses due by 4/17/2019 (Grasham, Debora)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC . (Grasham, Debora)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC. (Grasham, Debora)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan deadline set for 4/3/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC.(Grasham, Debora)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The McClathy Company for Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC.. (Grasham, Debora)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC, David A. Thompson Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/6/2019. (alw)
March 6, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC served on 3/4/2019. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw) Modified on 3/11/2019 to remove text (alw).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC from Ada County District Court, case number CV01-19-02394.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1856254.), filed by Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Summons, #4 Exhibit D to Service of Process, #5 Exhibit E to U.S. District Courts Stats, #6 Affidavit of Juan Cornejo in Support of Notice of Removal of Action, #7 Cover Sheet)(Grasham, Debora) Modified on 3/11/2019 to correct descriptions of exhibits (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Statesman Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Debora Kristensen Grasham
Represented By: Derek Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Thompson
Represented By: Michael A. Short
Represented By: Jeff R. Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?