Mendez v. Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc et al
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Defendant: John Hoxsey, Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc, Stephanie Chamberlain, Shuri Urquidi, Development Services Inc., Any Other agents and employees of Development Services, Shelli Daylong and Any Other Past and Present Board Members of the Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00092-DCN. (cjs)(Mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 4/2/2019 cjs).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (klw) on 3/25/2019.)(Mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 4/2/2019 cjs).
March 18, 2019 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 23922 (jp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND COUNTERCLAIM by Raul Mendez from Ada County Small Claims Court, case number CV01-19-01649., filed by Raul Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Cover Sheet)(jp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hoxsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuri Urquidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Development Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Other agents and employees of Development Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelli Daylong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Other Past and Present Board Members of the Moonridge Neighborhood Association Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?