Isbelle v. Denney

Plaintiff: Ryan Isbelle
Defendant: Lawrence Denney
Case Number: 1:2019cv00093
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-93-DCN (jp)
June 11, 2019 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lawrence Denney.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/17/2019.(Berry, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Isbelle. Replies due by 5/16/2019.(jp)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (cjs)(Mailed to Plaintiff on 4/17/2019.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lawrence Denney, Ryan Isbelle re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/10/2019. (cjs)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Robert Arthur Berry appearing for Defendant Lawrence Denney. Responses due by 4/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Dorothy Canary)(Berry, Robert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Isbelle. Lawrence Denney served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (cjs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Denney. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
March 19, 2019 RECEIPT: Filing Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 1336 (alw)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence Denney Summons Issued, filed by Ryan Isbelle. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isbelle v. Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Isbelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Denney
Represented By: Robert Arthur Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?