Hausrath et al v. United States Department of the Air Force
Plaintiff: Dale Reynolds, Meg Fereday, Joanie Fauci, Anne Hausrath, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Kathryn Railsback, John Wheaton and Roger Rosentretter
Defendant: US Air Force and United States Department of the Air Force
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/11/2019 09:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. (at)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Joanie Fauci, Meg Fereday, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Anne Hausrath, Kathryn Railsback, Dale Reynolds, Roger Rosentretter, John Wheaton. (Stellberg, Sarah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Joanie Fauci, Meg Fereday, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Anne Hausrath, Kathryn Railsback, Dale Reynolds, Roger Rosentretter, United States Department of the Air Force, John Wheaton re #6 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/9/2019. (jp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Department of the Air Force.(England, Christine)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT On Service of Complaint and Summons by Joanie Fauci, Meg Fereday, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Anne Hausrath, Kathryn Railsback, Dale Reynolds, Roger Rosentretter, John Wheaton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Lucas, Laurence)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 7/5/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Air Force (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Old Broads for Wilderness. (Stellberg, Sarah)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1867667.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lucas, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hausrath et al v. United States Department of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Reynolds
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meg Fereday
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanie Fauci
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Hausrath
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Railsback
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wheaton
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Rosentretter
Represented By: Sarah Stellberg
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?