Hunter v. State of Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Wylie G Hunter
Defendant: Does 1-5, Amy Jordan, Lisa Correia, Stephanie Nemore, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden, Brad Little, Christie Redenbo, Barry McHugh and Curtis Kastens
Case Number: 1:2019cv00113
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Barry McHugh.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2019.(Holmes, Jamila)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2019.(Hayes, Leslie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to Motions to Dismiss, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Wylie G Hunter. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for Hearing filed by Barry McHugh. Replies due by 6/19/2019.(Holmes, Jamila)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Barry McHugh.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/6/2019.(Holmes, Jamila)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 JOINDER by Defendant Barry McHugh joining #22 Reply to Response to Motion, to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. (Holmes, Jamila)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Request for Continuance and for Hearing (Dkt. #21 ). It is not entirely clear whether Plaintiff intends to amend his complaint in this action or file a separate lawsuit. Regardless, Plaintiff still must respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #12 , #13 ) in the present case. State Defendants do not oppose a continuance (Dkt. #23 ). Defendant McHugh has not expressed a position on the motion. Upon consideration, the Court will GRANT in PART and DENY in PART Plaintiff's Motion (Dkt. #21 ). The Motion is granted to the extent that Plaintiff shall have until June 28, 2019, to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. In light of the holidays, Defendants shall then have until July 17, 2019, to reply to their respective motions. Plaintiff's instant Motion is denied to the extent that a hearing is unnecessary. The Court expresses no opinion on Plaintiff's comments regarding amendment. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for Hearing filed by Lisa Correia, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden. Replies due by 6/18/2019.(Hayes, Leslie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Correia, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/5/2019.(Hayes, Leslie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Continuance and for Hearing by Plaintiff Wylie G Hunter. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp) (*this is the same document as dkt 20 re-filed to be a pending motion)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION To Rule 12 Motion(s) to Dismiss, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, and DECLARATION of Wylie Hunter in Support filed by Wylie G Hunter. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-113-DCN(jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amy Jordan, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, & Lawrence Wasden served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. -Governor Brad Little (Attachments: #1 - Stephanie Nemore, #2 -Lawrence Wasden, #3 -Christie Redenbo, #4 -Amy Jordan)(jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lisa Correia, Curtis Kastens & Barry McHugh served on 4/8/2019, answers due 4/29/2019. -Barry McHugh (Attachments: #1 -Curtis Kastens, #2 -Lisa Correia)(jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Barry McHugh served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (jp)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Jamila Daphne Holmes appearing for Defendant Barry McHugh. Responses due by 5/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Holmes, Jamila)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Leslie Marie Hayes appearing for Defendants Lisa Correia, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hayes, Leslie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Barry McHugh answer due 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Barry McHugh re #7 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/24/2019. (cjs)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Fraud on the Court Jamila Daphne Holmes appearing for Defendant Barry McHugh. Responses due by 5/15/2019 (Holmes, Jamila)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila Daphne Holmes on behalf of Barry McHugh (Holmes, Jamila)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lisa Correia, Wylie G Hunter, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden re #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/24/2019. (cjs)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Marie Hayes on behalf of Lisa Correia, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, State of Idaho, Lawrence Wasden (Hayes, Leslie)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division (Northern). Corrected to Southern Division and case reassigned to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00113-REB for all future filings. (cjs)
April 5, 2019 RECEIPT: CIVIL FILING FEE Fee Received $400.00, receipt #IDX2001343 PAID IN FULL. (jld)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion and MOTION to Vacate Judgment for Fraud on the Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Wylie G Hunter; Exhibits by Plaintiff Wylie G Hunter. Responses due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 & 3, #3 Exhibit 4 & 5, #4 Exhibit 6, 7 & 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, 11 & 12, #7 Exhibit 13 part 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit 13 part 2 of 2)(cjs)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lisa Correia, Amy Jordan, Curtis Kastens, Brad Little, Barry McHugh, Stephanie Nemore, Christie Redenbo, Lawrence Wasden. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Wylie G Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylie G Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Jordan
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Correia
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Nemore
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Wasden
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Little
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Redenbo
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry McHugh
Represented By: Jamila Daphne Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Kastens
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?