King Hutton et al v. Blaine County School District #61 et al
Plaintiff: Emily Thayer and Dakota King Hutton
Defendant: GwenCarol Holmes, Amanda LaChance, John Pearce, Teresa McGoffin, Heather Crocker, Blaine County District #61, Michael Glenn, Keith Nelson, John Doe and Blaine County School District #61
Case Number: 1:2019cv00116
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Motion re #7 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42 filed by Blaine County School District #61. (Gardner, David) Modified on 7/8/2019 to change text and remove reply deadline(alw).
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Blaine County School District #61. (Gardner, David) Modified on 7/8/2019 to change text and remove reply deadline (alw).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42 filed by Dakota King Hutton, Emily Thayer. Replies due by 7/5/2019.(Linnet, Samuel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dakota King Hutton, Emily Thayer. Replies due by 7/5/2019.(Linnet, Samuel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42 filed by Blaine County School District #61.(Gardner, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Bifurcate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42 David Paul Gardner appearing for Defendant Blaine County School District #61. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Gardner, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Blaine County School District #61.(Gardner, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) David Paul Gardner appearing for Defendant Blaine County School District #61. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Gardner, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Blaine County School District #61, Heather Crocker, John Doe, Michael Glenn, GwenCarol Holmes, Dakota King Hutton, Amanda LaChance, Teresa McGoffin, Keith Nelson, John Pearce, Emily Thayer re #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/2/2019. (alw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul Gardner on behalf of All Defendants (Gardner, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Blaine County School District #61, Heather Crocker, Michael Glenn, GwenCarol Holmes, Amanda LaChance, Teresa McGoffin, Keith Nelson, John Pearce. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Crocker, #2 Summons Glenn, #3 Summons Holmes, #4 Summons LaChance, #5 Summons McGoffin, #6 Summons Nelson, #7 Summons Pearce)(alw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1871160.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BCSD, #3 Summons Crocker, #4 Summons Glenn, #5 Summons Holmes, #6 Summons LaChance, #7 Summons McGoffin, #8 Summons Nelson, #9 Summons Pearce)(Linnet, Samuel) Modified on 4/9/2019 to remove duplicate wording on attachments (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Hutton et al v. Blaine County School District #61 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GwenCarol Holmes
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda LaChance
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pearce
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa McGoffin
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Crocker
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine County District #61
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glenn
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Nelson
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine County School District #61
Represented By: David Paul Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Thayer
Represented By: Samuel L Linnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota King Hutton
Represented By: Samuel L Linnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?