Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC, David Boren and Lynn Arnone
Defendant: Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service, Forest Supervisor Jim Demaagd, Area Ranger Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Kirk Flannigan and Jim Demaagd
Amicus Curiae: Idaho Conservation League
Case Number: 1:2019cv00118
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Maynard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Maynard, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Eaton Malmen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Malmen, Erika)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court concludes Plaintiffs have not demonstrated that they are likely to succeed on the merits of the three claims - Counts Two, Three, and Four of their Complaint - raised in their motion. Further, the balance of hardships does not tip decidedly in favor of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Per the parties' stipulation, Defendants' time in which to respond to the Complaint is extended until July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) Christine Gealy England appearing for Defendants Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (England, Christine)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by Paul Turcke for the Plaintiff; Christine England for the Defendant. Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2019 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral argument heard. Motion taken UNDER ADVISEMENT. Order forthcoming. Time in Court 1:33-3:01 PM. (ESR A. Tate.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 6. (at)
May 31, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2019.(Turcke, Paul)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER The Court has reviewed the Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief #13 , the Motion to File Amicus Brief #18 , and the parties' non-opposition for leave to file #15 , #16 . The Court finds the proffered information may provide additional relevant information relating to the facts and claims brought in this matter. See 4 AM. JUR. 2D Amicus Curiae ' 3 (2002); see also Hoptowit v. Ray, 682 F.2d 1237, 1260 (9th Cir. 1982). Accordingly, the motions #13 , #18 , are GRANTED, and the Idaho Conservation League may appear in a limited capacity in this matter, in the form of the brief and declaration submitted #18 .. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to File Amicus Brief and Declaration of John Robison Marie Callaway Kellner appearing for Amicus Idaho Conservation League. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Robison)(Kellner, Marie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service. Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Declaration of Michael Hurst, #2 Declaration of Matthew Phillips, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B Part 1, #5 Exhibit B Part 2, #6 Exhibit B Part 3, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F)(England, Christine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and to Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC. Replies due by 6/7/2019.(Turcke, Paul)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service re #13 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and to Participate as Amicus Curiae Notice of Non-Opposition (England, Christine)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service Notice of Lodging of the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter C. Gomben, #2 Administrative Record Index)(England, Christine)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and to Participate as Amicus Curiae Marie Callaway Kellner appearing for Amicus Idaho Conservation League. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Kellner, Marie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2019 01:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. (at)
May 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Per the Order (dkt 7) Responses due by 5/24/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (jp)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Paul A Turcke appearing for Plaintiffs Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration - Boren, #3 Declaration - Donovan)(Turcke, Paul)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Upon review of this matter, and in consideration of the parties' stipulation #6 , the parties have until 5:00 p.m. on May 6, 2019, within which to consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge to hear and decide all matters in this case. See Notice of Assignment #5 . If not all parties consent by that time, the case will be automatically reassigned to a District Judge on May 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION on Initial Procedural Matters and Scheduling, re #6 . Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION on Initial Procedural Matters and Scheduling by Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC. (Turcke, Paul)
April 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/19/2019. (jp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on USFS; USAG; SNRA; SNF; Demaarg; Flannigan on 04/16/19, filed by Lynn Arnone, David Boren, Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC. (Turcke, Paul)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of All Defendants (England, Christine)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jim Demaagd, Kirk Flannigan, Sawtooth National Forest, Sawtooth National Recreation Area, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jp)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1871751.), filed by Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC, Lynn Arnone, David Boren. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Turcke, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawtooth National Recreation Area
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Supervisor Jim Demaagd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Area Ranger Kirk Flannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawtooth National Forest
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Flannigan
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Demaagd
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawtooth Mountain Ranch LLC
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Represented By: Erika Eaton Malmen
Represented By: Robert A Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boren
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Represented By: Erika Eaton Malmen
Represented By: Robert A Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Arnone
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Represented By: Erika Eaton Malmen
Represented By: Robert A Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Idaho Conservation League
Represented By: Marie Callaway Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?