Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II et al v. Ada County, Idaho et al

Plaintiff: Horizon Tower, LLC and Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II
Defendant: Ada County, Idaho and Board of Ada County Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2019cv00125
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan deadline set for 9/2/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 09:30 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ada County, Idaho, Board of Ada County Commissioners, Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II, Horizon Tower, LLC re #1 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/19/2019. (alw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ada County, Idaho, Board of Ada County Commissioners.(Rutherford, Richard)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ada County, Idaho, Board of Ada County Commissioners. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian L. Webb (Webb, Brian)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II, Horizon Tower, LLC. (Webb, Brian)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ada County, Idaho, Board of Ada County Commissioners ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1875442.), filed by Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II, Horizon Tower, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Ada Co., #3 Summons Summons for Board of Ada Co. Commissioners)(Webb, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II et al v. Ada County, Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Tower, LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Tower Limited Partnership-II
Represented By: Brian L. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County, Idaho
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Ada County Commissioners
Represented By: Richard S Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?