Stewart v. Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Vicky M Stewart
Defendant: Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC, Vicky M Stewart re #7 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/22/2019. (alw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC.(Ashby, D.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (km)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. All Counsel and any pro se parties are directed to confer and provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (the Report) by August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (km)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicky M Stewart re #3 Summons Issued Darren Richman, Registered Agent (Williams, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
April 24, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00144-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Robert J Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1877884.), filed by Vicky M Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons of Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC)(Williams, Daniel) Modified on 4/25/2019 (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascent Behavioral Health Services, LLC
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky M Stewart
Represented By: Daniel E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?