Smith v. Stinker Stations, Inc
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Smith
Defendant: Stinker Stations, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00158
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Disc Received from Plaintiff Matthew A. Smith. (Exhibits) (jp)(located in clerk's office)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Matthew A. Smith. (jp)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; STAYING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's applications to proceed in forma pauperis #1 and #7 are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Execution #4 is GRANTED. The above-captioned case is stayed for 120 days. The District Court Executive shall set a case management deadline for 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Matthew A. Smith re #2 Complaint. (jp)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00158-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew A. Smith. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (jp)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Matthew A. Smith. (jp)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Stay of Execution re #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Matthew A. Smith. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(jp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/7/2019) (jp).
April 30, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-158-BLW. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Stinker Stations, Inc, filed by Matthew A. Smith.(jd) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jd).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew A. Smith. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (jd) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Stinker Stations, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stinker Stations, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?