The Prudential Company of America v. Judd et al
Plaintiff: THE PRUDENTIAL COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICHELLE BROWN, RACHELLE STEBBINS, DANN HALL and ERIKA JUDD
Not Yet Classified: ESTATE OF PAULA F. HALL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00162
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Company of America. Brad Williams waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Diddle, Samuel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Company of America. Dann Hall waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Diddle, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Company of America. Erika Judd waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Diddle, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Company of America. Michelle Brown waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Diddle, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Prudential Company of America. Rachelle Stebbins waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Diddle, Samuel)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00162-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michelle Brown, Brad Hall, Dann Hall, Erika Judd, Rachelle Stebbins. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Hall Summons, #2 Rudd Summons, #3 Brown Summons, #4 Stebbins Summons)(km)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Diddle, Samuel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Judd et al. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1882917.), filed by THE PRUDENTIAL COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ERIKA JUDD, #3 Summons BRAD WILLIAMS, #4 Summons MICHELLE BROWN, #5 Summons RACHELLE STEBBINS, #6 Summons DANN HALL)(Diddle, Samuel) Modified on 5/9/2019 to correct docket text (km).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Company of America v. Judd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHELLE STEBBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANN HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIKA JUDD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PRUDENTIAL COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ESTATE OF PAULA F. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?