Stoltzfus et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Lisa Stoltzfus and Myron Stoltzfus
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTION Complaint for Refund by Lisa Stoltzfus, Myron Stoltzfus. (Martelle, Martin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00165-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1883358.), filed by Myron Stoltzfus, Lisa Stoltzfus. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Martelle, Martin) Modified on 6/28/2019 to seal per Mr. Martelle's request. Document includes personal identifiers. See Redacted complaint at dkt 4 (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoltzfus et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stoltzfus
Represented By: Martin J Martelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Stoltzfus
Represented By: Martin J Martelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?