Van Hook et al v. State of Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Van Hook, Gabriel Van Hook and Nathan Van Hook
Defendant: John Doe(s) 1-100, Mary Grant, Idaho Bar Association, Idaho Legal Aid, Adams County Idaho, D. Christopher Boyd, Virginia Bond, State of Idaho, Unknown Agents (of Idaho Third Judicial District), Fisher Law firm, Bond Law Chartered, Kimberli Stretch, Steven Fisher and Christopher D. Boyd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00170
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Quash (FRCP 12(B)(4) & (5)), #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service MOTION to Quash for Failure to Properly Serve filed by Ronald Van Hook. Replies due by 7/5/2019.(alw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Adams County Idaho, Virginia Bond, Bond Law Chartered, Christopher D. Boyd, Steven Fisher, Fisher Law firm, Mary Grant, Idaho Bar Association, Idaho Legal Aid, John Doe(s) 1-100, State of Idaho, Kimberli Stretch, Unknown Agents (of Idaho Third Judicial District). (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/21/2019) (jd). (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/21/2019) (jd).
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficiency of Service, MOTION to Quash for Failure to Properly Serve ( Responses due by 6/27/2019)Michael J Kane appearing for Defendants Adams County Idaho, Christopher D. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kane, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State of Idaho.(Kronberg, Chris)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Quash (FRCP 12(B)(4) & (5)) Keely E. Duke appearing for Defendants Virginia Bond, Bond Law Chartered. Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Duke, Keely)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Declaration, Notice served on All defendants on 5/24/19, filed by Ronald Van Hook. (alw)
May 8, 2019 RECEIPT: CIVIL FILING FEE Fee Received $400.00, receipt #IDX24230 PAID IN FULL. (jld)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Nathan Van Hook, Gabriel Van Hook, Ronald Van Hook. (jd)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for violations of (1) 42 U.S.C. 1983 - Civil Rights Violations (2) 18 USC Chapter 96 Racketeering (3) 15 USC Chapter 1 Monopolies against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(jd) Modified on 5/9/2019 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hook et al v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Legal Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Idaho
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Christopher Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Bond
Represented By: Bryan A Nickels
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Chris Kronberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Agents (of Idaho Third Judicial District)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Law firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond Law Chartered
Represented By: Bryan A Nickels
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberli Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Boyd
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Van Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?