Complete Office, LLC v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Complete Office, LLC
Defendant: Christopher Johnson and Workspace Concepts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION re 21 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Fourth Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Per Docket Text Order, docket #21)(st)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The parties' Third Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #20 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to answer Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages and respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended to 7/2/2019. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re 19 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, 16 Order,, Third Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 6/25/2019. (Per Docket Text Order, docket #19)(st)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The parties' Second Stipulation To Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #18 is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until 6/25/2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages and respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text- only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re 16 Order,, Second Stipulation to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. The parties' Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer Complaint and Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #14 is accepted and entered into the record. The deadline for Defendants to answer Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages and respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 3, is extended to 6/18/2019. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 3, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Complete Office, LLC, Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC re #1 Complaint, #13 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/2/2019. (alw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Walters, Matthew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Walters on behalf of Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC (Walters, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Office, LLC. Workspace Concepts, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Dale, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Office, LLC. Christopher Johnson served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Dale, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Anna L Rothschild for Complete Office, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher M Pardo for Complete Office, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 16, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00175-SAB on all future pleadings. (st)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stanley A. Bastian from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Anna L. Rothschild. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1887756.)James C Dale appearing for Plaintiff Complete Office, LLC. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Dale, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Pardo. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1887749.)James C Dale appearing for Plaintiff Complete Office, LLC. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Dale, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction James C Dale appearing for Plaintiff Complete Office, LLC. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of John Williams, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Williams, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of John Williams, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of John Williams, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of John Williams, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of John Williams, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of John Willliams, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration of John Williams, #10 Exhibit H to Declaration of John Williams)(Dale, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Complete Office, LLC. (Dale, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Christopher Johnson, Workspace Concepts, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1887689.), filed by Complete Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Christopher Johnson, #4 Summons Workspace Concepts, LLC)(Dale, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Complete Office, LLC v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Office, LLC
Represented By: James C Dale
Represented By: Christopher M Pardo
Represented By: Anna L Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workspace Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Matthew L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?