Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford v. Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust et al

Plaintiff: Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross of Idaho, Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust, Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc and Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-183-BLW(jp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc, Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust, Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford re #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/19/2019. (jp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc.(Diddle, Samuel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust.(Diddle, Samuel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford. Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Park, Jin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Park, Jin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc, Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1890092.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Park, Jin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford v. Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc. d/b/a Blue Cross of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho AGC Self-Funded Benefit Trust
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc
Represented By: Samuel Andrew Diddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford
Represented By: Jin Hee Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?