Martinez v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr.
Defendant: John Doe, Jason R. Chandler and Stephanie Morgan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00201
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT (Notice sent to Finance). Plaintiffs Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Second Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #8 ) is MOOT. The Director of the Idaho Department of Correction or his designee will collect from Plaintiffs prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Order mailed and addressed as follows: Josh Tewalt, Director, Idaho Department of Correction, Attn: Inmate Accounts, 1299 N Orchard, Suite 110, Boise, ID 83706.) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #8 Supplement, #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr. (km)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Second Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (km)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr re #3 Complaint. (km)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Request from Romelio Martinez (km)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (km)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (km)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jason R. Chandler, John Doe(Sheriff Bingham County), John Doe(Physician Ada County), John Doe(Sheriff Malheur County), Stephanie Morgan, filed by Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (km)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr. (km)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romelio Alvin Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason R. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?