Byerly v. Idaho Board of Correction et al
Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Respondent: Idaho Department of Correction, Ada County Public Defender, Idaho Board of Correction, Ada County Court Clerk, Ada County Court and Dwayne A Shedd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nathan Byerly (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jd) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jd).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF OPENING OF CIVIL RIGHTS CASE, re #1 Complaint filed by Nathan Byerly. IT IS ORDERED that, within 21 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff may file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal if he no longer intends to pursue this civil rights action. If Plaintiff does not do so, the Court will consider his application for in forma pauperis status. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Byerly. (jp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Nathan Byerly. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (jp)
June 10, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Due to clerical error at case opening, case has been reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-207-DCN. (jp)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Habeas Corpus PETITION (Prisioner Complaint) filed by Nathan Byerly.(jd)
June 6, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - This document was entitled as a Prisoner Complaint #1 AND a Habeas Corpus Petition #2 . The clerk will proceed with case opening using the Prisoner Complaint (dkt #1 ). (jd) Modified on 6/10/2019 to edit text (jp).
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Ada County Court, Ada County Court Clerk, Ada County Public Defender, Idaho Board of Correction, Idaho Department of Correction and Dwayne A Shedd, filed by Nathan Byerly. (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byerly v. Idaho Board of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Idaho Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ada County Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Idaho Board of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ada County Court Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ada County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwayne A Shedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?