Dreyer et al v. Idaho Department of Health and Welfare et al
Plaintiff: Estate Representativ Jamie Foruria, Benjamin William, Shelby Bloom, Erika Dreyer, Jamie Newton, Penney Pease, Wendy Mastroeni, Jamie Foruria, Wendy Gilnet and William Benjamin
Defendant: Southwest Idaho Treatment Center, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, Billy King, John and Jane Does 1-100, Luke Brisbane, Debra Luper, Corbin Burkett, State of Idaho, Director, Southwest Idaho Treatment Center, Deborah Combs, Jason Miller and Leondre Edwards
Case Number: 1:2019cv00211
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace appearing for Defendants Luke Brisbane, Corbin Burkett, Deborah Combs, Director, Southwest Idaho Treatment Center, Leondre Edwards, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, John and Jane Does 1-100, Billy King, Debra Luper, Jason Miller, Jamie Newton, State of Idaho. Responses due by 8/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Cynthia Yee-Wallace)(Yee-Wallace, Cynthia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by William Benjamin, Shelby Bloom, Erika Dreyer, Jamie Foruria, Wendy Gilnet, Wendy Mastroeni, Penney Pease. (Azman, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Corbin Burkett, Deborah Combs, Leondre Edwards, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, Billy King, Debra Luper, Jason Miller, Jamie Newton, State of Idaho. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: Jason Miller #1 Summons Corbin Burkett, #2 Summons Deborah Combs, #3 Summons Leondre Edwards, #4 Summons IDHW, #5 Summons Billy King, #6 Summons Debra Luper, #7 Summons Jamie Newton, #8 Summons State of Idaho)(jd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Summons IDHW, #4 Summons Newton, #5 Summons State of Idaho, #6 Summons King, #7 Summons Burkett, #8 Summons Combs, #9 Summons Luper, #10 Summons Miller, #11 Summons Edwards)(Quade, Charlene)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Director, Southwest Idaho Treatment Center, Idaho Department of Health and Welfare, Jamie Newton, State of Idaho. (Print attached Summons for service.)(Attachments: #1 Summons as to Health and Welfare, #2 Summons as to State of Idaho, #3 Summons as to Jamie Newton)(jd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Quade, Charlene)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket entry ORDER approving #2 and #3 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney's Mark R. Azman and Shamus O'Meara for all the plaintiffs. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 13, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Case was filed without a cover sheet. The filing party shall file the cover sheet using "Civil Cover Sheet" located under other documents.(jd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shamus P. O'Meara. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1899602.)Charlene K Quade appearing for Plaintiffs Shelby Bloom, Erika Dreyer, Jamie Foruria, Wendy Mastroeni, Jamie Newton, Penney Pease, Benjamin William. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Quade, Charlene) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/13/2019) (jd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1899595.)Charlene K Quade appearing for Plaintiffs Shelby Bloom, Erika Dreyer, Jamie Foruria, Wendy Mastroeni, Jamie Newton, Penney Pease, Benjamin William. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Quade, Charlene) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/13/2019) (jd).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Dreyer, et. al, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1899574.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DRI Report, #2 Exhibit B- OPE Report, #3 Summons Director SWITC, #4 Summons Idaho Dept. of Health and Welfare, #5 Summons Jamie Newton, #6 Summons State of Idaho)(Quade, Charlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreyer et al v. Idaho Department of Health and Welfare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate Representativ Jamie Foruria
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin William
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Bloom
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Dreyer
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penney Pease
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Mastroeni
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Foruria
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Gilnet
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Benjamin
Represented By: Sean R. Beck
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Shamus P O'Meara
Represented By: Mark R Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Idaho Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Health and Welfare
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy King
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Brisbane
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Luper
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbin Burkett
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Southwest Idaho Treatment Center
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Combs
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Miller
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leondre Edwards
Represented By: Cynthia Lin Yee-Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?