Byerly v. Shedd et al
Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Respondent: A DeWayne Shedd and Keith Yordy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00213
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. The earliest-filed case, Byerly v. Idaho, 1:19-cv-00130-BLW, will the lead case. All filings must be made in the lead case. The Court notifies Petitioner that any second amended petition must contain all of Petitioner's habeas claims in all three consolidated cases. Any such petition must be filed, in the lead case (Case No. 1:19-cv-00130-BLW), no later than August 19, 2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00130-BLW, 1:19-cv-00182-BLW, 1:19-cv-00213-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
July 12, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, per order dkt. no. #10 . Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00213-BLW. (jd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - 1. Petitioners Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #5 ) is GRANTED. 2. Because the Honorable B. Lynn Winmill, United States District Judge, is currently presiding over another of Petitioners habeas cases challenging the same pending criminal charges, see Byerly v. Idaho, Case No. 1:19-cv-00130-BLW, this case is hereby REASSIGNED to Judge Winmill. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Byerly. (Attachments: #1 cover letter/ declaration)(jp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Nathan Byerly. Responses due by 7/15/2019 (jp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document by Nathan Byerly. (jp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Disregard ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jd).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Nathan Byerly, A DeWayne Shedd, Keith Yordy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/12/2019. (jd)
June 13, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Disregard docket No. 4 as it is a duplicate entry.(jd) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jd). Modified on 6/18/2019 (jd).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Byerly. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byerly v. Shedd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A DeWayne Shedd
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Yordy
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Byerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?