Hunter v. State of Idaho et al
Plaintiff: Wylie G Hunter
Defendant: James Siebe, Terry Morgan, John Redal, Does 1-5, Doug Phelps, Ted Pulver, State of Idaho, Ann Wick, Ron Sutton, Misty Whited, Brad Little, Lansing Haynes, Barry McHugh and Richard Shabazian
Case Number: 1:2019cv00227
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: This action is stayed pending United States District Court Judge Nye's resolution of the motion to consolidate cases in case no. 1:19-CV-113-DCN. All deadlines related to the motion for an order to void judgments #20 are hereby terminated consistent with the Court's Order at Docket #17 . Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF))(ah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wylie G Hunter. Lansing Haynes served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; Brad Little served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019; Barry McHugh served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Terry Morgan served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Doug Phelps served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Ted Pulver served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; John Redal served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Richard Shabazian served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019; James Siebe served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; Ron Sutton served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019; Ann Wick served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 -Bernard McHugh, #2 -Judge Lansing Haynes, #3 - John Redal, #4 - James Siebe, #5 - Ted Pulver, #6 - ISP Terry Morgan, #7 -ISP Ron Sutton, #8 - Richard Shabazian, #9 - Doug Phelps, #10 - Ann Wick, Misty Whited)(jp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for an Order to Void the Judgments and Orders on Wylie G. Hunter and Criminal Case State v. Hunter Case No. CR-2007-20448 by Plaintiff Wylie G Hunter. Responses due by 8/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wylie G Hunter. Replies due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(jp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jp)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY ANSWER/MOTION TO DISMISS PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (DKT #15 ) - To promote the speedy, just, and inexpensive determination of these matters, the Court will grant the motion to stay. Fed. R. Civ. P. 1. All deadlines in this matter related to the Complaint (Dkt. 1), Motion to Vacate Judgment (Dkt. 3), Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 12), and Motion to Consolidate Cases (Dkt. 14), are hereby vacated, to be reset should the cases remain separate. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 JOINDER by Defendants Barry McHugh, Ann Wick joining #15 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Holmes, Jamila)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Leslie Marie Hayes appearing for Defendants Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Terry Morgan, State of Idaho, Ron Sutton. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Hayes, Leslie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Leslie Marie Hayes appearing for Defendants Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Terry Morgan, Ron Sutton. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hayes, Leslie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila Daphne Holmes on behalf of Ann Wick (Holmes, Jamila)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Jack S Gjording appearing for Defendant John Redal. Responses due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gjording, Jack)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Dwight Phelps on behalf of Doug Phelps, Ted Pulver (Phelps, Douglas)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to James Siebe re #8 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/16/2019. (jp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Barry McHugh (of Related Filing) (Holmes, Jamila)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Siebe on behalf of James Siebe (Siebe, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Wylie G Hunter and counsel for Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Barry McHugh, Terry Morgan, State of Idaho, Ron Sutton re #4 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/13/2019. (jp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayton Patrick Reed on behalf of Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Terry Morgan, State of Idaho, Ron Sutton (Reed, Dayton)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Marie Hayes on behalf of Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Terry Morgan, State of Idaho, Ron Sutton (Hayes, Leslie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamila Daphne Holmes on behalf of Barry McHugh (Holmes, Jamila)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to vacate judgment for fraud on the court; Memorandum of points and authorities; Declaration of Wylie G. Hunter; and exhibits 1-28 by Plaintiff Wylie G Hunter. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibits 8-17, #3 Exhibits 18-24, #4 Exhibits 25-27, #5 Exhibit 28)(jp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lansing Haynes, Brad Little, Barry McHugh, Terry Morgan, Doug Phelps, Ted Pulver, John Redal, Richard Shabazian, James Siebe, Ron Sutton, Misty Whited, Ann Wick. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Wylie G Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. State of Idaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylie G Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Siebe
Represented By: James Edward Siebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Morgan
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Redal
Represented By: Jack S Gjording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Phelps
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Pulver
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Wick
Represented By: Jamila Daphne Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Sutton
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Whited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Little
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing Haynes
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry McHugh
Represented By: Jamila Daphne Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shabazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?