Scoyni v. United States District Court of Idaho 9th Circuit
Plaintiff: Nicholas D Scoyni
Defendant: United States district court Idaho 9th circuit
Case Number: 1:2019cv00232
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney attn: civil clerk by Nicholas D Scoyni. Served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (jd)
June 24, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00232-DCN. (km)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Upon review of the complaint and the nature of the allegations, and to further the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action, the Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to the Honorable David C. Nye for disposition. The Clerk is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
June 21, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee Fee Received $ 400, receipt # IDX100024440 final payment (jd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for violation of civil rights against United States district court Idaho 9th circuit, filed by Nicholas D Scoyni. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scoyni v. United States District Court of Idaho 9th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States district court Idaho 9th circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D Scoyni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?