Sivak v. Doe
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST to proceed without payment of costs re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Lacey Sivak. (alw)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak (Attachments: #1 USCA instructions)(jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 19-35652 as to #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (Notice sent by e-mail to Court Reporter) (Attachments: #1 Guide to USCA)(jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 19-35652 for #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lacey Sivak. (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appeal/Incorporated Brief of 24 July 2019 D.C.N. - NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Lacey Sivak. Filing fee $ 505. (Notice sent to Court Reporter & 9th Cir) (jd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL DATA of 22 July 2019 for case, by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. (jd)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or establish imminent danger of serious physical injury. IfPlaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to show imminent danger, the Courtwill dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lacey Sivak. (jd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Motion to proceed w/out cost to Petitioner)(jd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for prompt intervention and action on /exparte by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supplemental Data)(jd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to join the United States as a co-plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for court order to preserve property belonging to plaintiff by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (alw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against John Doe, filed by Lacey Sivak. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H, #9 Appendix I, #10 Appendix J, #11 Appendix K, #12 Appendix L, #13 Appendix M, #14 Appendix N, #15 Appendix O, #16 Appendix P, #17 Appendix Q, #18 Appendix R, #19 Appendix S, #20 Appendix T, #21 Appendix U, #22 Appendix V, #23 Appendix W, #24 Appendix X, #25 Appendix Y, #26 Appendix Z, #27 Appendix AA, #28 Appendix BB, #29 Appendix CC, #30 Appendix DD, #31 Appendix EE, #32 Appendix FF, #33 Appendix GG)(jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivak v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?