Velasquez v. Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Kelli Velasquez
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelli Velasquez. (Berger, Erik)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelli Velasquez. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Berger, Erik)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelli Velasquez (Berger, Erik)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Hartford Life)(jd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Erik W. Berger for Kelli Velasquez Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by Plaintiff Kelli Velasquez entitled Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice . (Maeser, Greg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/28/2019) (jd). Modified on 6/28/2019 to make form unfillable (jd).
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by Plaintiff Kelli Velasquez . (Maeser, Greg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Erik W Berger. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1905950.)Greg J Maeser appearing for Plaintiff Kelli Velasquez. Responses due by 7/18/2019 (Maeser, Greg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1905942.), filed by Kelli Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Maeser, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directv Group Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Velasquez
Represented By: Greg J Maeser
Represented By: Erik W Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?