Madison Mountain Medical, LLC v. Eddy
Plaintiff: Madison Mountain Medical, LLC
Defendant: Chris Eddy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00244
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: William B Shubb
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chris Eddy, filed by Madison Mountain Medical, LLC.(Roe, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT re #5 Stipulation filed by Madison Mountain Medical, LLC. Plaintiff Madison Mountain Medical, LLC, may file its proposed First Amended Complaint in the form as attached to the Stipulation. Defendant Chris Eddy shall have 40 days from the date the First Amended Complaint is filed to respond. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Joint Litigation Plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 14, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00244-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Madison Mountain Medical, LLC. (Roe, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Madison Mountain Medical, LLC. (Roe, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Chris Eddy. (Squyres, B)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Chris Eddy and Madison Mountain Medical, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/30/2019. (jd)
June 28, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Chris Eddy served on 6/28/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chris Eddy from Fourth Judicial District - Ada County, case number CV01-19-10370.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1906883.), filed by Chris Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket - Exhibit A, #3 State Court Complaint Exhibit B, #4 State Court Notice of Removal - Exhibit C)(Squyres, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison Mountain Medical, LLC v. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Mountain Medical, LLC
Represented By: Melodie Annalise McQuade
Represented By: Michael O. Roe
Represented By: Alexander P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael O Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Eddy
Represented By: B Newal Squyres
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Alexandra Shantel Grande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?