Wright v. Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Jean M WRIGHT and Jean Wright
Defendant: Mr Dennis Montgomery, Loretta J Montgomery, Jeannie Montgomery and Dennis Montgomery
Case Number: 1:2019cv00263
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dennis Montgomery, Jeannie Montgomery.(Street, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #10 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (jd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Norris Street on behalf of All Defendants (Street, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dennis Montgomery and Jeannie Montgomery. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00263-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Second APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Robert Clark appearing for Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Clark, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Jean Wright. Responses due by 7/30/2019 (jd)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jean M WRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Fee Waive rApplication)(Mitchell, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Dennis Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Montgomery
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Jeffrey Norris Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Montgomery
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Represented By: Jeffrey Norris Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean M WRIGHT
Represented By: William Genther Mitchell
Represented By: Eric Robert Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Wright
Represented By: William Genther Mitchell
Represented By: Eric Robert Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?