Habenicht et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Brett Habenicht and Brenda Habenicht
Defendant: Jane Doe Johnson and Randal L. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00269
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brenda Habenicht and Brett Habenicht and mailed to Randal L. Johnson re #8 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/4/2019. (jd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Answer of Defendant Randal L. Johnson to #1 Complaint.(jd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brett Habenicht, Brenda Habenicht as to Jane Doe Johnson. (Gardner, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett Habenicht, Brenda Habenicht. Randal L. Johnson served on 7/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Gardner, David)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (jd)
July 23, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00269-RJB on all future pleadings. (st)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan from the Western District of Washington for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe Johnson and Randal L. Johnson. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Money Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1911831.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Gardner, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habenicht et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Habenicht
Represented By: David Philip Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Habenicht
Represented By: David Philip Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randal L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?