Bosse v. Blades et al
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Defendant: Randy Blades, RDU Staff, Officer Lee and RDU Sargeants 8 House
Case Number: 1:2019cv00271
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees (Prisoner) by Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter) (ckh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Michael Bosse requesting a blank pleading form (mailed a copy in 1:19-cv-270 case). (ckh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Earl Bosse. (ckh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (ckh)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Subpoena of RDU- Camera Footage Files and Corizon Medical Filesby Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Earl Bosse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Earl Bosse. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosse v. Blades et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDU Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDU Sargeants 8 House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?