Lounsbury et al v. Frito-Lay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lounsbury and Christy Lounsbury
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc., FL Transportation, Inc., Chip Ordway and Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2019cv00272
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Due to reassignment of this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 9/30/2019 02:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 9/23/2019. (at)
September 4, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. Judge William B. Shubb no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:19-cv-00272-CWD. (ckh)
September 4, 2019 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ckh) Modified on 9/5/2019 to correct filing date (ckh).
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A joint litigation plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 6, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00272-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Frito-Lay, Inc., Chip Ordway, FL Transportation, Inc.. (Fuhrman, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FL Transportation, Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PepsiCo, Inc. for Frito-Lay, Inc... (Fuhrman, William)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs and defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/13/2019. (jd)
July 15, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00272-BLW. (jd)
July 11, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District Court, County of Ada, case number CV01-19-03012.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1911861.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Register of Actions, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit A - Summons, #5 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Dismiss in 14 Days, #6 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Intent to Dismiss in 14 Days, #7 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal from State Court to Federal Court)(Fuhrman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lounsbury et al v. Frito-Lay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lounsbury
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Gariepy
Represented By: Richard Norman Gariepy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Lounsbury
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Gariepy
Represented By: Richard Norman Gariepy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FL Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Ordway
Represented By: William A Fuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?