Wilstead v. United Heritage Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steve Wilstead
Defendant: United Heritage Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00276
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A joint litigation plan must be filed 14 calendar days prior to the scheduling conference. (Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM before Judge William B. Shubb.). Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 6, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00276-WBS on all future pleadings. (st)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge William B. Shubb from the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 18, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-276-BLW (alw)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another magistrate judge or to a district judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Madison Tate Donaldson for Steve Wilstead Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1912907.)Richard R. Friess appearing for Plaintiff Steve Wilstead. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Friess, Richard)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Heritage Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1912892.), filed by Steve Wilstead. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Friess, Richard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2019 with PDF that cannot be edited/) (ckh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilstead v. United Heritage Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Heritage Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wilstead
Represented By: Richard R. Friess
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?