Western Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 1:2019cv00283
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
August 29, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #14 Order on Motion to Stay. The correct date for filing the Joint Status Report should be November 4, 2019 not 2018.(jd)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STAY BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [DKT. #7 ] AND VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The parties Joint Motion and Stipulation to Stay Briefing and Vacate Scheduling Conference, ECF No #13 , is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference presently scheduled for October 28, 2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Talasi B Brooks appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 9/18/2019 (Brooks, Talasi)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 DISREGARD Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd) This was meant to be a Notice to file Corporate Disclosure. Modified on 8/27/2019 (jd).
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiff and defendant re #1 Complaint and #9 Answer to Amended Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/28/2019. (jd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Bureau of Land Management.(Firpo, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lake on behalf of Western Watersheds Project (Lake, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Talasi B Brooks appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(Brooks, Talasi)
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bureau of Land Management answer due 8/28/2019. (km)
August 19, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard the Set Deadlines/Hearings event entered on 8/19/19, as the wrong date was set. This date will be re-set by the Clerk. (km)
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bureau of Land Management answer due 9/15/2019. (km)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Watersheds Project. Bureau of Land Management served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration/Exhibit)(Brooks, Talasi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT as of Right against Bureau of Land Management, filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Complaint showing markup)(Brooks, Talasi)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on October 28, 2019, at 11:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9945 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before October 21, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
July 23, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The summons filed with the complaint #1 is not the correct summons form. Please refile the summons using the form located on the courts webpage. You may contact the court with directions on resubmitting the summons.(jd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1915312.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Summons FOIA Summons, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Talasi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Robert Burke Firpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Talasi B Brooks
Represented By: Scott Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?