Giltner Logistics, Inc. v. All Ways Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Giltner Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: All Ways Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant All Ways Transport, Inc. Kyle Eric Bastian appearing for Plaintiff Giltner Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle E. Bastian, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Kyle E. Bastian, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Kyle E. Bastian, #4 Affidavit of Greg Paulson, #5 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Greg Paulson, #6 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Greg Paulson, #7 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Greg Paulson)(Bastian, Kyle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Giltner Logistics, Inc. (alw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default Kyle Eric Bastian appearing for Plaintiff Giltner Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kyle E. Bastian, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Kyle E. Bastian)(Bastian, Kyle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giltner Logistics, Inc.. All Ways Transport, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Bastian, Kyle)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Ways Transport, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Giltner Logistics, Inc.. (Bastian, Kyle)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Ways Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1916745.), filed by Giltner Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Cover Sheet)(Bastian, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giltner Logistics, Inc. v. All Ways Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giltner Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Eric Bastian
Represented By: Brooke Baldwin Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Ways Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?