Booher v. AT&T Customer Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonya Booher
Defendant: AT&T Customer Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00296
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Bill R Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER / CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Billy Roy Wilson (ARED). Rule 26 Conference Deadline: 1/15/20. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29/2020. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/7/19. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kenneth W Gage for AT&T Customer Service, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings Tyler J Anderson appearing for Defendant AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Tate, #3 Declaration of Johnathan Koonce)(Anderson, Tyler)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kenneth W. Gage. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1965407.)Tyler J Anderson appearing for Defendant AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (Anderson, Tyler)
November 4, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Bill R Wilson. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00296-BRW on all future pleadings. (st)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Bill R Wilson from the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Due to reassignment, the 10/2/19 TSC before Judge Bush is VACATED. (lc)
October 1, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-296-BLW (alw)
October 1, 2019 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. (Campbell, Stacey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by AT&T Customer Service, Inc. Joint Discovery Plan. (Campbell, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before SEPTEMBER 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (alw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T Customer Service, Inc..(Campbell, Stacey)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Per the stipulated motion, Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is now 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (kcs)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Stacey A Campbell appearing for Defendant AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. Responses due by 8/27/2019 (Campbell, Stacey)
August 1, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stacey A. Campbell for AT&T Customer Service, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/30/2019. (ckh)
July 30, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1918940.)Tyler J Anderson appearing for Defendant AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Anderson, Tyler)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Customer Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc, Other Affiliate Directv Group Holdings, LLC for AT&T Customer Service, Inc... (Anderson, Tyler)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Customer Service, Inc. from District Court of the Fourth Judicial District of the State of Idaho, In and For the County of Ada, case number CV01-19-12887.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1918925.), filed by AT&T Customer Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons State Court Summons, #3 State Court Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booher v. AT&T Customer Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Customer Service, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Represented By: Stacey A. Campbell
Represented By: Stacey A Campbell
Represented By: Kenneth W Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Booher
Represented By: Eric S Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?