Pollock v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Leon Pollock
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Does I-X and Roe Corporations I-X
Case Number: 1:2019cv00304
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Mark J. Orler appearing for Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Orler, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W. Dale: Appearance by Douglas Crandall, Kenneth Friedman, and James Hertz for the Plaintiff; James Thomson II for the Defendants. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2019. Court noted Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans were filed in this matter. Consent process discussed. Parties agree to participate in mediation on or before 4/1/2020. Telephonic Status Conference to be set on 3/9/2020, with specific time to be included in forthcoming Scheduling Order. Time in Court 11:05-11:16 AM. (Hearing not recorded.) (at)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY PLAN by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company . (Thomson, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Thomson, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 9/12/2019. (at)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #7 and #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kenneth R. Friedman and James A. Hertz for Leon Pollock Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kenneth Friedman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1931444.)Douglas W Crandall appearing for Plaintiff Leon Pollock. Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Crandall, Douglas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James Hertz. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1931441.)Douglas W Crandall appearing for Plaintiff Leon Pollock. Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Crandall, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leon Pollock Service of Summons and Complaint (Crandall, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on September 12, 2019, at 10:00 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before September 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Orler, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.. (Thomson, James)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and counsel for Leon Pollock re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/4/2019. (jd)
August 2, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company from Canyon County, case number CV14-19-00333.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1920829.), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Complaint #2 Exhibit B, Summons, Nationwide #3 Exhibit C, Letter re: service of summons #4 Exhibit D, Notice of Appearance #5 Exhibit E, Answer #6 Exhibit F, Scheduling conference #7 Exhibit G, Motion to appear #8 Exhibit H, Order #9 Exhibit I, Motion for pro hac #10 Exhibit J, Order re: trial dates #11 Exhibit K, Stipulated trial dates#12 Exhibit L, Order re: pro hac #13 Exhibit M, Order setting case #14 Exhibit N, Defendant's motion #15 Exhibit O, Order re: Disqualification #16 Exhibit P, Notice of service #17 Exhibit Q, Notice of service #18 Exhibit R, Notice of service #19 Exhibit S, State court docket #20 Exhibit T, Defendant's response)(Orler, Mark) Modified on 8/5/2019 to add exhibit names (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollock v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Pollock
Represented By: Kenneth R. Friedman
Represented By: Douglas W Crandall
Represented By: James A. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark J. Orler
Represented By: James S Thomson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?