Nez Perce Tribe v. Midas Gold Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Nez Perce Tribe
Defendant: Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Stibnite Gold Company, Midas Gold Idaho Inc. and Midas Gold Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00307
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company identifying Corporate Parent Midas Gold Corp. for Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company.. (Carter, Preston)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Nez Perce Tribe, Stibnite Gold Company re #7 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/4/2019. (jp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 , #9 and #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ronald Tenpas,Margaret Peloso and Theresa L. Romanosky for Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc. and Stibnite Gold Company Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Theresa L. Romanosky. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935298.)Christopher H Meyer appearing for Defendants Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Meyer, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Margaret Peloso. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935295.)Christopher H Meyer appearing for Defendants Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Meyer, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ronald Tenpas. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935285.)Christopher H Meyer appearing for Defendants Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Meyer, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (Meyer, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #4 Stipulation filed by Midas Gold Corp., Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Stibnite Gold Company, Midas Gold Idaho Inc.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) *correcting docket number referenced for the stipulation
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho, Inc., Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, and Stibnite Gold Company (collectively, Defendants) to respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) shall be extended to October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (ckh)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc., Stibnite Gold Company. (Carter, Preston)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nez Perce Tribe. All Defendants. (Lopez, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC, Midas Gold Corp., Midas Gold Idaho Inc. and Stibnite Gold Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Idaho Gold, #2 Midas Gold, #3 Stibnite)(jd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1923629.), filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Attachment 1 to Complaint, #3 Appendix Attachment 2 to Complaint, #4 Appendix Attachment 3 to Complaint, #5 Appendix Attachment 4 to Complaint)(Rogerson, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nez Perce Tribe v. Midas Gold Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Gold Resources Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Ronald Tenpas
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Theresa L. Romanosky
Represented By: Margaret Peloso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stibnite Gold Company
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Ronald Tenpas
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Theresa L. Romanosky
Represented By: Margaret Peloso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midas Gold Idaho Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Ronald Tenpas
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Theresa L. Romanosky
Represented By: Margaret Peloso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midas Gold Corp.
Represented By: Christopher H Meyer
Represented By: Ronald Tenpas
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Theresa L. Romanosky
Represented By: Margaret Peloso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nez Perce Tribe
Represented By: Amanda Wright Rogerson
Represented By: Michael Anthony Lopez
Represented By: Bryan Jack Hurlbutt
Represented By: Laurence J Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?