Johnson v. Law Property Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Defendant: Randy Hoffer, Bobbie Vaughn, Law Property Management, LLC, LLaw Property Management and John and Jane Does I-XX
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Johnson. Randy Hoffer served on 9/22/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Johnson, Eileen)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/21/2019 11:00 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 12/2/2019 10:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 11/25/2019. (at)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS by Renee Johnson. (Johnson, Eileen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Randy Hoffer, Law Property Management, LLC, Bobbie Vaughn. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jp)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on October 21, 2019, at 11:00 A.M. mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before October 15, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (jd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy Hoffer, Law Property Management, LLC, Bobbie Vaughn ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1927009.), filed by Renee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Ertz, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Law Property Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLaw Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Represented By: Brian A Ertz
Represented By: Eileen R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?