Dillon v. USA
Petitioner: Cherie R Dillon
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00320
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Government's response shall be filed on or before October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion Kevin T Maloney appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 10/2/2019 (Maloney, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2255. Reference Criminal Case Number 1:16-cr-37-BLW (km)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 1:16-cr-37-BLW.), filed by Cherie R Dillon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Memorandum in Support)(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: William M Humphries
Represented By: Kevin T Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cherie R Dillon
Represented By: Greg S Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?