U.S. Geothermal Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Geothermal Inc.
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00322
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN, NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Lynette Case, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct an initial scheduling conference by telephone on NOVEMBER 5, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. (MTN. TIME), to discuss the entry of a scheduling order to govern the case going forward. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before OCTOBER 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James Michael Young and #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michael R Goodstein for Federal Insurance Company. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael R. Goodstein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1951519.)Tyler J Anderson appearing for Defendant Federal Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Anderson, Tyler)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James Young. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1951508.)Tyler J Anderson appearing for Defendant Federal Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Anderson, Tyler)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company.(Anderson, Tyler)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited for Federal Insurance Company.. (Anderson, Tyler)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #12 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/25/2019. (ckh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Anderson on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Anderson, Tyler)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #10 Stipulated Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Based on the parties' stipulation, Defendant shall move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (kcs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Federal Insurance Company. (Thomas, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Geothermal Inc.. Federal Insurance Company served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Carter, Preston)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 Motions for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Brittany E. Parks, Caroline Hurtado Ford, David P. Bender, Jr., and Michael J. Stoner for U.S. Geothermal Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael J. Stoner. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935249.)Preston N Carter appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Geothermal Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Carter, Preston)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David P. Bender Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935247.)Preston N Carter appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Geothermal Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Carter, Preston)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Caroline Hurtado Ford. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935244.)Preston N Carter appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Geothermal Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Carter, Preston)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brittany E. Parks. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1935234.)Preston N Carter appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Geothermal Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Carter, Preston)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Geothermal Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ormat Nevada, Inc. for U.S. Geothermal Inc... (Carter, Preston)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Federal Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1928844.), filed by U.S. Geothermal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Carter, Preston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Geothermal Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Represented By: Stephen R Thomas
Represented By: James M Young
Represented By: Michael R Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Geothermal Inc.
Represented By: Jason Blakley
Represented By: Preston N Carter
Represented By: Michael J. Stoner
Represented By: Caroline Hurtado Ford
Represented By: David P. Bender, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany E. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?