Dunlap v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Allan Dunlap
Defendant: Campbell and Ramirez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00327
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Court by Timothy Allan Dunlap (alw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed (move) in Support by Plaintiff Timothy Allan Dunlap. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (alw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Expand Record re: Appendixby Plaintiff Timothy Allan Dunlap. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(alw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for IFP Status re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Timothy Allan Dunlap. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (alw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Court (ADR) by Timothy Allan Dunlap (appears to be missing 1 page -- notified prison paralegal) (ckh)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION - IT IS ORDERED:1. Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED.2. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $400.00 or present facts showing that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. If Plaintiff does not pay the fee and fails to establish imminent danger, the Court will dismiss this case without further notice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account. This is a sealed document. re #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Allan Dunlap. (ckh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Allan Dunlap. Responses due by 9/19/2019. (ckh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Campbell, Former Warden Ramirez, filed by Timothy Allan Dunlap.(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Allan Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?