Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Verity Property Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Verity Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00335
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings: 1:19-cv-335-BLW. (ckh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 The consent deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ckh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #3 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/16/2019. (ckh)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge and Consent Form immediately. The parties are directed to respond to the Notice of Assignment no later than October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (dg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION Proposed Consent Decree Roberta L. Steele appearing for Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Steele, Roberta)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R N Monteleone on behalf of Verity Property Management, Inc. (Monteleone, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Verity Property Management, Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verity Property Management, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Steele, Roberta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Verity Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verity Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R N Monteleone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Roberta L. Steele
Represented By: May R Che
Represented By: John Freeman Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?