Cutbirth v. Boise Project Board of Control
Plaintiff: Rod Cutbright and Rod Cutbirth
Defendant: Boise Project Board of Control
Case Number: 1:2019cv00341
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. (st)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #5 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/16/2019. (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Walrath on behalf of Boise Project Board of Control (Walrath, Jennifer)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Boise Project Board of Control.(Walrath, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00341-NDF on all future pleadings. (st)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy D Freudenthal from the District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rod Cutbirth. (Birch, Erika)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Boise Project Board of Control. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1935260.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Birch, Erika) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/5/2019 with PDF that cannot be edited) (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutbirth v. Boise Project Board of Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Cutbright
Represented By: Charles Alan Johnson
Represented By: Erika Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod Cutbirth
Represented By: Charles Alan Johnson
Represented By: Erika Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Project Board of Control
Represented By: Pamela Simmons Howland
Represented By: Jennifer M Walrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?