Koivisto v. Allstate Insurance, LTD.
Petitioner: Mr. Tauno A. Koivisto, III and Mister Tauno A. Koivisto, III
Respondent: Allstate Insurance, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00343
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Initial Review Order filed on this date, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Additionally, this case is ordered closed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Petitioners Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Case has been reassigned with District Judge. No more notice of assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
October 28, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B. Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:19-cv-00343-BLW. (jd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Mister Tauno A. Koivisto, III.(jd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/12/2019. (kt)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing -(kt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tauno A. Koivisto, III.(kt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tauno A. Koivisto, III. (kt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Tauno A. Koivisto, III. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koivisto v. Allstate Insurance, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Allstate Insurance, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Tauno A. Koivisto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mister Tauno A. Koivisto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?