Snyder v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Sally J Snyder
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00346
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of the Court of second electronic case transfer to Northern District of California re 4 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel. (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of the Court of electronic case transfer to Northern District of California re #4 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel. (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (CTO-157) TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL No. 2741 for U.S. District Court for the N.D. California. (Attachments: #1 MDL text entry, #2 MDL text entry)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER- CTO 157 for MDL No. 2741. (Attachments: #1 MDL text entry) (ckh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1936996.), filed by Sally J Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Points, Michelle) Modified on 9/11/2019 to remove incorrect/duplicate wording(alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally J Snyder
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?